Global Patent Index - EP 0972134 A1

EP 0972134 A1 2000-01-19 - DEVICE FOR REGULATING THE FLOW OF ELECTRICITY THROUGH A CONSUMER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR REGULATING THE FLOW OF ELECTRICITY THROUGH A CONSUMER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG DES STROMFLUSSES DURCH EINEN VERBRAUCHER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR REGULER LE PASSAGE D'UN COURANT A TRAVERS UN CONSOMMATEUR

Publication

EP 0972134 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925406 A

Priority

  • DE 9800799 W
  • DE 19713981 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19713981A1] The invention relates to a device for regulating the flow of electricity through a consumer, wherein the flow of electricity is monitored in the form of a reference voltage by an analog input and a digital input of a computer unit. The voltage which is measured on the analog input is used to regulate the flow of electricity. The voltage at the digital input is measured as a low or high signal and used to interrupt the flow of electricity when a low signal is available.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/05 (2006.01); G05F 1/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845597A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19713981 A1 19981015; DE 59813143 D1 20051201; EP 0972134 A1 20000119; EP 0972134 B1 20051026; JP 2001521655 A 20011106; US 6204693 B1 20010320; WO 9845597 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813143 P 20051201

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040525

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT