Global patent index - EP 0972158 A1

EP 0972158 A1 2000-01-19 - METHOD OF PRODUCING AN ANTI-DAZZLE SCREEN FOR AN ELECTRIC LIGHT FITTING AND AN ANTI-DAZZLE SCREEN PRODUCED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING AN ANTI-DAZZLE SCREEN FOR AN ELECTRIC LIGHT FITTING AND AN ANTI-DAZZLE SCREEN PRODUCED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD

Title (de)

ERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES BLENDESCHUTZFILMES FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN ERSTELLTER BLENDESCHUTZSCHIRM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN ECRAN ANTIEBLOUISSANT DESTINE A DES LUMIERES ELECTRIQUES ET ECRAN ANTIEBLOUISSANT PRODUIT SELON CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0972158 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902345 A

Priority

  • SE 9800146 W
  • SE 9701216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845646A1] The present invention relates to a method of producing a combined anti-dazzle screen and a reflector (3) for a long fluorescent tube fitting (1), including lateral reflectors (5) and ribs (6), which connect the reflectors to each other and which ribs are wedge-shaped in cross section, with the wedge point (19) turned away from the source of light of the fitting and are fastened with their ends (7) in recesses (8) in said lateral reflectors (5) and which are bent from plane blanks made of metal and/or a plastic material. In accordance with the invention a completely punched rib blank (6) is, within the area for the rib point (19) to be made and on the exterior side (18) of the rib to be made, provided with a through material weakening (17), preferably made through embossing, subsequent to which the blank sides (14, 16) on each side of the weakening (17) are brought towards each other with said weakening as a swinging or folding centrum, until the blank sides (14, 16) bear on each other within the area of the rib point (19), obtained in this way, with an intact bridge (20) between the blank sides. The invention relates also to a cross-directed rib (6), produced according to the described method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845646A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845646 A1 19981015; AU 5889998 A 19981030; DE 69830482 D1 20050714; DE 69830482 T2 20060316; EP 0972158 A1 20000119; EP 0972158 B1 20050608; NO 323097 B1 20070102; NO 994120 A 19990826; NO 994120 D0 19990826; SE 507223 C2 19980427; SE 9701216 D0 19970404; SE 9701216 L 19980427

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140202

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69830482

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140202

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140202

2014-09-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69830482

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69830482

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DR. HOFFMEISTER & BISCHOF, PATENTANWALT UND RE, DE

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121206

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-05-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060309

2005-08-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-07-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69830482

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-07-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI GB NL

2005-06-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-10-13 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-09-22 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 20040314

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JOHANSSON, JOERGEN

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990819

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI GB NL