Global patent index - EP 0972252 A1

EP 0972252 A1 2000-01-19 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM FAULT DIAGNOSTICS

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM FAULT DIAGNOSTICS

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM FEHLERDIAGNOSEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DIAGNOSTIC DE DEFAILLANCES DE SYSTEMES DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Publication

EP 0972252 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98911981 A

Priority

  • GB 9706521 A
  • US 9805736 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9844428A1] A telecommunications fault location and diagnostic system employs a remote test unit (RTU) (2) to collect system parameter data. The RTU is operatively coupled to a trained neural network (30) which receives the system parameter data from the RTU (2). The neural network (3) is trained using pre-screened historical fault data which is stored in a database. Once trained the neural network classifies the RTU data into one of a predetermined number of fault probabilities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/24 (2006.01); H04M 3/08 (2006.01); H04M 3/22 (2006.01); H04M 3/24 (2006.01); H04Q 3/00 (2006.01); H04M 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04Q 3/0087 (2013.01); H04L 41/16 (2013.01); H04M 3/08 (2013.01); H04M 3/22 (2013.01); H04M 3/2254 (2013.01); H04M 3/247 (2013.01); H04Q 3/0075 (2013.01); H04M 3/301 (2013.01); H04M 3/305 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9419888 A1
  • [Y] WO 9610890 A2
  • [Y] WO 9509463 A1
  • [A] EP 0712227 A2
  • [Y] TOTTON K A E: "EXPERIENCE IN USING NEURAL NETWORKS FOR ELECTRONIC DIAGNOSIS" PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORKS, 18 November 1991 (1991-11-18), XP002910910
  • See also references of WO 9844428A1

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9844428 A1 19981008; AU 6580798 A 19981022; CA 2285239 A1 19981008; EP 0972252 A1 20000119; EP 0972252 A4 20010221; GB 2327553 A 19990127; GB 2327553 B 20020821; GB 9706521 D0 19970521

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20091203

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CYBULA LIMITED

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030612

2001-02-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010105

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991028

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE