Global patent index - EP 0972260 A2

EP 0972260 A2 2000-01-19 - A DIGITAL MULTIMEDIA EDITING AND DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

Title (en)

A DIGITAL MULTIMEDIA EDITING AND DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM EDITIEREN VON DIGITALEN MULTIMEDIADATEN UND ZUR DATENVERWALTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME NUMERIQUE D'EDITION MULTIMEDIA ET DE GESTION DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 0972260 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98957305 A

Priority

  • US 9815795 W
  • US 83287297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905821A2] A machine control subsystem is used to provide centralized control during broadcast in a news production system. A director workstation is coupled to a server, which is in turn coupled to any number of external devices that may be used during broadcast to air and display video or audio images. The director workstation uses a graphical user interface to display a list of events that are to occur during the production. The events include all events that are to be aired by any of the coupled devices. A director at the workstation may then control the production of all of the types of events from a centralized control station. To select an event or a sequence of events for production, the director may simply select the event from an event list, and the event will be broadcast without the director having to know particular characteristics of the device to display the event. The director workstation is coupled to a server. The server includes device manager software for interfacing with and controlling the operation of all of the externally coupled devices. By providing a centralized communication pathway between the director workstation and the devices, the server may forward status information about the devices to the director workstation to facilitate redirection of ressources by the director.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30; G11B 27/00; H04N 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 27/031 (2006.01); G11B 27/034 (2006.01); G11B 27/34 (2006.01); H04N 5/222 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 27/34 (2013.01); G11B 27/031 (2013.01); G11B 27/034 (2013.01); H04N 5/222 (2013.01); G11B 2220/41 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905821A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905821 A2 19990204; WO 9905821 A3 19990422; AU 1359299 A 19990216; CA 2284886 A1 19990204; EP 0972260 A2 20000119; JP 2001522568 A 20011113; JP 4278189 B2 20090610

INPADOC legal status

2011-10-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110510

2011-05-10 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R003

2010-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVID TECHNOLOGY, INC.

2005-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050104

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVID TECHNOLOGY, INC.

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991104

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB