Global patent index - EP 0972282 A1

EP 0972282 A1 2000-01-19 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A MATRIX DISPLAY CELL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A MATRIX DISPLAY CELL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER MATRIXANZEIGESTELLE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UNE CELLULE D'UN ECRAN MATRICIEL

Publication

EP 0972282 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98949077 A

Priority

  • FR 9802236 W
  • FR 9715863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2772501A1] The invention concerns a device for controlling a matrix display cell comprising a set of control circuits (P'ij) arranged in lines and in columns and controlling an elementary point (XL), the state of each elementary point being a function of first and second control signals (L'i, C'j) applied on the control circuit (P'ij) respectively by the lines (L'I) and the columns (C'j). The control circuit (P'ij) consists of a first transistor (MN2) connecting the elementary point (XL) to the corresponding line (L'i) receiving the first signal and a second transistor (MN1) whereof a first electrode is connected to the first transistor grid, which is itself connected to the corresponding column (C'j) receiving the second signal, and whereof the second electrode is connected to a reference potential. The invention is particularly applicable to flat screens such as liquid crystal displays or electroluminescent displays.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/36; G09G 3/30; G09G 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/133 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/30 (2006.01); G09G 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2011 (2013.01); G09G 3/30 (2013.01); G09G 3/3648 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0809 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0814 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0842 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0259 (2013.01); G09G 2310/027 (2013.01); G09G 2310/066 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931650A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2772501 A1 19990618; FR 2772501 B1 20000121; DE 69828158 D1 20050120; DE 69828158 T2 20051222; EP 0972282 A1 20000119; EP 0972282 B1 20041215; JP 2001512588 A 20010821; KR 20000070943 A 20001125; US 2002130827 A1 20020919; US 6844874 B2 20050118; WO 9931650 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091019

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081019

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69828158

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20050120

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-12-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09G 3/30 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09G 3/32 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09G 3/36 A

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09G 3/30 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09G 3/32 B

2004-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09G 3/36 A

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES AVIONICS LCD S.A.

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990724

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL