Global patent index - EP 0972310 A1

EP 0972310 A1 2000-01-19 - METHOD FOR FABRICATING LOW-RESISTANCE CONTACTS ON NITRIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FABRICATING LOW-RESISTANCE CONTACTS ON NITRIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON KONTAKTEN MIT NIEDRIGEM WIDERSTAND AUF HALBLEITERANORDNUNGEN AUS EINER NITRIDVERBINDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CONTACTS A FAIBLE RESISTANCE SUR DES DISPOSITIFS A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS DE NITRURE

Publication

EP 0972310 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98906549 A

Priority

  • JP 3770597 A
  • US 9803146 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837586A1] A method for fabricating an electrical contact (12) on a surface (11) of a semiconductor comprising a group III element and nitrogen. The contact (12) is formed by depositing a metallic layer on the semiconductor surface and then annealing the layer at a tempeature greater than 400 DEG C for at least 4 hours. The method can be used to construct a Au/Ni contact on GaN semiconductor surface with substantially less resistivity than that obtained by conventional methods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/28 (2006.01); H01L 33/04 (2010.01); H01L 33/32 (2010.01); H01L 33/40 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 33/40 (2013.01); H01L 33/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9837586A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837586 A1 19980827; EP 0972310 A1 20000119; JP H10242074 A 19980911

INPADOC legal status

2001-11-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010920

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (A DELAWARE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990722

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB