Global Patent Index - EP 0972374 A1

EP 0972374 A1 2000-01-19 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EFFICIENT AUTHENTICATION AND INTEGRITY CHECKING USING HIERARCHICAL HASHING

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EFFICIENT AUTHENTICATION AND INTEGRITY CHECKING USING HIERARCHICAL HASHING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EFFIZIENTEN AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG UND PRÜFUNG DER INTEGRITÄT UNTER VERWENDUNG VON HIERARCHISCHEM HASHING

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL EFFICACE D'AUTHENTIFICATION ET DE VERIFICATION D'INTEGRITE UTILISANT LE HACHAGE HIERARCHIQUE

Publication

EP 0972374 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905733 A

Priority

  • US 9902417 W
  • US 1853198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940702A1] In accordance with the present invention a method is provided for signing data and verifying data. Data signing involves dividing a data set into packets, hashing the data within each of the packets to produce a hash block including hash values and applying a digital signature to the hash block. The verifying process involves receiving a packet including data, a hash block and a digital signature, verifying the digital signature, hashing the data to produce hash values and comparing the hash values to values in the hash block.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09C 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 9/3236 (2013.01); H04L 9/3247 (2013.01); H04L 2209/38 (2013.01); H04L 2209/80 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940702A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940702 A1 19990812; AU 2583099 A 19990823; EP 0972374 A1 20000119; JP 2001519930 A 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040216

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991004

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE