Global patent index - EP 0972376 A1

EP 0972376 A1 2000-01-19 - A CONTROL SYSTEM FOR MANAGING A DISTRIBUTED NETWORK

Title (en)

A CONTROL SYSTEM FOR MANAGING A DISTRIBUTED NETWORK

Title (de)

KONTROLLSYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES VERTEILTEN NETZWERKES

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DESTINE A GERER UN RESEAU DISTRIBUE

Publication

EP 0972376 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98912626 A

Priority

  • GB 9800889 W
  • GB 9706490 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9844681A1] The present invention concerns a control system for controlling a distributed intelligent network, the system comprising a digital processor, input means for receiving input commands, analysis means for carrying out lexical and syntactical analysis on input commands to generate target code, means for responding to a partial command to generate data signals indicative of a range of options, and means responsive to a chosen option from the indicated range to cause the analysis means to re-analyse the original command together with the chosen option so as to generate a further set of data signals indicative of a set of further options.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/24 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04Q 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 41/00 (2013.01); H04L 12/24 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04Q 3/0062 (2013.01); H04L 69/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9844681A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9844681 A1 19981008; AU 6740698 A 19981022; CA 2285199 A1 19981008; EP 0972376 A1 20000119; GB 9706490 D0 19970514

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 9/44 A, 7H 04L 12/24 B

2002-03-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 9/44 A, 7H 04L 12/24 B

2002-02-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 9/44 A, 7H 04L 12/24 B

2002-01-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 9/44 A, 7H 04L 12/24 B

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 9/44 A, 7H 04L 12/24 B

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 9/44 A, 7H 04L 12/24 B

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990920

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB