Global patent index - EP 0972431 A2

EP 0972431 A2 2000-01-19 - PARTICLE MANIPULATION

Title (en)

PARTICLE MANIPULATION

Title (de)

TEILCHENMANIPULIERUNG

Title (fr)

MANIPULATION DE PARTICULES

Publication

EP 0972431 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98919213 A

Priority

  • DE 19713637 A
  • EP 9801938 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19713637A1] The invention relates to a method for manipulating particles which are in a plasma crystalline state in a plasma of a carrier gas. According to the method, the particles are subjected at least partly to a plasma treatment and/or applied to the surface of a substrate. A device for manipulating particles in the plasma crystalline state comprises a reaction vessel in which plasma electrodes and at least one substrate are placed. The invention provides an adaptive electrode for creating a low frequency or static electric field at selected sites in the reaction vessel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/46 (2006.01); H05H 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05H 3/04 (2013.01); Y10S 977/773 (2013.01); Y10S 977/84 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19713637 A1 19981022; DE 19713637 C2 19990218; DE 59813144 D1 20051201; EP 0972431 A2 20000119; EP 0972431 B1 20051026; JP 2001518230 A 20011009; US 6517912 B1 20030211; WO 9844766 A2 19981008; WO 9844766 A3 19990107

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090402

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090402

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090402

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080402

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080410

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060111

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59813144

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20051201

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040615

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991018

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL