Global Patent Index - EP 0972457 A3

EP 0972457 A3 2000-04-12 - Protective device particularly for skating

Title (en)

Protective device particularly for skating

Title (de)

Schutzvorrichtung insbesondere für das Üben des Skatings

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection, en particulier destiné à la pratique du patin

Publication

EP 0972457 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99112234 A

Priority

FR 9809249 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972457A2] The protector consists of a flexible inner member at least partially covering the part of the body being protected, an outer rigid shell and fasteners (61, 62, 63). The shell is in two or more sections (40, 41) connected by hinges (42) which can be adjusted before fixing with locking elements (5) in the form of straps with buckles or Velcro (RTM) strips. The hinges can be made by zones of reduced thickness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 13/08; A41D 13/06; A63B 71/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/06 (2006.01); A41D 13/08 (2006.01); A63B 71/12 (2006.01); A63B 71/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/082 (2013.01); A41D 13/065 (2013.01); A41D 13/088 (2013.01); A63B 71/1225 (2013.01); A63B 71/14 (2013.01); A63B 2071/125 (2013.01); A63B 2209/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972457 A2 20000119; EP 0972457 A3 20000412; EP 0972457 B1 20030820; AT 247392 T 20030915; DE 69910504 D1 20030925; DE 69910504 T2 20040226; FR 2781164 A1 20000121; FR 2781164 B1 20001027; US 6219843 B1 20010424

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080703

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-02-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910504 P 20030925

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2003-08-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020611

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROTECTIVE DEVICE PARTICULARLY FOR SKATING

2000-04-19 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI