Global Patent Index - EP 0972462 A1

EP 0972462 A1 2000-01-19 - Sportshoe

Title (en)

Sportshoe

Title (de)

Sportschuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de sport

Publication

EP 0972462 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99112990 A

Priority

FR 9809248 A

Abstract (en)

The sports boot comprises an upper (2), an external sole (3) and a fastener (5) intended to engage a fastener associated with the sports article. The upper has in its lower part a continuous peripheral girdle (4) on which each of the fasteners is fixed. The girdle can be placed inside or outside the upper.

Abstract (fr)

La chaussure de sport comprend une tige (2), une semelle externe (3) et au moins un organe d'accrochage (5) destiné à coopérer avec un organe d'accrochage associé d'un article de sport. Elle est caractérisée en ce que la tige (2) est munie à sa partie inférieure d'une ceinture périphérique (4) continue, au moins semi-rigide, et en ce que chaque organe d'accrochage (5) de la chaussure est fixé sur ladite ceinture périphérique (4). La ceinture périphérique (4) peut être disposée à l'intérieur ou à l'extérieur de la tige (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0401 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972462 A1 20000119; EP 0972462 B1 20031112; AT 253849 T 20031115; DE 69912688 D1 20031218; DE 69912688 T2 20040819; FR 2781130 A1 20000121; FR 2781130 B1 20000915; JP 2000037203 A 20000208; US 6266899 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070706

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912688 P 20031218

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2003-11-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020503

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-06-28 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI