Global Patent Index - EP 0972472 B1

EP 0972472 B1 2001-03-14 - Method for adjusting a sitting or lying element

Title (en)

Method for adjusting a sitting or lying element

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Einstellung eines Liege- oder Sitzelementes

Title (fr)

Procédé de réglage d'un élément de couchage ou de siège

Publication

EP 0972472 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113310 A

Priority

  • EP 98113310 A
  • US 57393500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972472A1] Transversally positioned, slightly elastic straps (2) are fixed with one of their ends to one of the long sides (1) of a rectangular frame. The opposite ends are guided around a bar (5), positioned along the inside of the frame (1) and joined to short sticks (3), which can be pushed towards the center of the frame (1) by the tip of a screw (4), which is rotated in order to put a certain tension on the strap (2). Each of the straps (2) can be individually adjusted either according to the feedback of the person occupying the bed, or by the use of sensors (8).

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Einstellung eines Liege- oder Sitzelementes mit einem Tragrahmen (1) und quer zu diesem verlaufenden elastischen Bändern (2) mit einstellbarer Vorspannung, welche durch Auflegen einer Person verschieden weit nach unten verformt werden, wobei für den Benützer individuell eine ideale Kontur der verformten Liege- bzw. Sitzfläche und eine ideale Druckverteilung festgelegt werden und, während der Benützer auf dem Element aufliegt, sowohl die Verformung der Bänder (2) wie der Auflagedruck gemessen werden und durch Veränderung der Vorspannung dem gewünschten Wert angenähert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 31/12; A47C 23/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/28 (2006.01); A47C 31/04 (2006.01); A47C 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 31/123 (2013.01); A47C 23/28 (2013.01); A47C 31/04 (2013.01); A47C 31/126 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972472 A1 20000119; EP 0972472 B1 20010314; AT 199634 T 20010315; DE 59800535 D1 20010419; ES 2157628 T3 20010816; US 6311570 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070717

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070717

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070716

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-08-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-03 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060803

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: NIEDERMUHLBICHLER BARTHOLOMAUS

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-09-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157628 T3

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG * ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800535 20010419

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2001-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199634 T 20010315

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990714

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI