Global patent index - EP 0972476 A1

EP 0972476 A1 2000-01-19 - Suspension device with label holder

Title (en)

Suspension device with label holder

Title (de)

Aufhänger mit Etikettenhalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de suspension avec porte-étiquette

Publication

EP 0972476 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114020 A

Priority

DE 29812645 U

Abstract (en)

The holder is built as a flat wall section (6;7) which is enclosed on at least one side by a wide strengthening brace (8;9). A retaining plate (17;21) attached firmly to the brace extends out from the flat wall section. The brace and enclosed wall section are essentially rectangular in shape. An opening (16;20) located above the retaining plate extends towards both sides of the plate as well as from the free end of the plate to the section of the brace lying opposite. The plate is located offset to the plane of the side region of the flat wall section. The hanger has a hook (1) for hanging onto a rod, on whose upper edge the lower edge of the brace and the opposing wall section connect.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen aus Kunststoff hergestellten Aufhänger, insbesondere Wäschebügel oder Kleiderbügel, der einen als flachen Wandabschnitt (6;7) ausgebildeten Etikettenhalter aufweist, welcher zumindest an einer Seite von einem breiten Verstärkungsgurt (8;9) begrenzt ist. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, einen einfach im Kunststoff-Spritzgießverfahren herstellbaren Aufhänger mit Etikettenhalter zu schaffen, bei dem ein Etikett leicht ausgewechselt werden kann. Diese Aufgabe wird erfindungsgemäß dadurch gelöst, daß aus dem flachen Wandabschnitt (6;7) eine an einer Seite fest mit dem Verstärkungsgurt (8;9) verbundene Haltelasche (17;21) mittels eines die Haltelasche (17;21) umsäumenden Durchbruchs (16;20) herausgetrennt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/1407 (2013.01); A47G 25/1421 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29812645 U1 19981203; EP 0972476 A1 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011017

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI