Global Patent Index - EP 0972484 A1

EP 0972484 A1 2000-01-19 - Thermal disk device for single-brush polishing machines

Title (en)

Thermal disk device for single-brush polishing machines

Title (de)

Thermische Scheibe für Poliergerät mit einziger Bürste

Title (fr)

Disque thermique pour appareil de polissage à brosse unique

Publication

EP 0972484 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99113722 A

Priority

IT MI981634 A

Abstract (en)

A single-brush polishing machine is provided with a thermal disk device composed of a rotating polishing disk (1) and a fixed disk (5) which is associated with it face-to-face and made of material with good heat-conducting properties and in which an electric resistance (6) is incorporated. Silicone grease is applied onto the contact surface between the fixed disk (5) and the polishing disk (1) in order to ensure lubrication and promote the transfer of heat from the first to the second disk, while keeping the distance between them as small as possible. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/164; B24B 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/164 (2006.01); B24B 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/186 (2013.01); A47L 11/164 (2013.01); A47L 11/4038 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5587021 A 19961224 - HOERSCH GUIDO [DE], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972484 A1 20000119; EP 0972484 B1 20071121; DE 69937590 D1 20080103; DE 69937590 T2 20081023; ES 2296357 T3 20080416; IT MI981634 A1 20000117; IT MI981634 D0 19980716

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100714

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100713

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100713

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100713

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69937590

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100713

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100210

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080822

2008-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2296357 T3

2008-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937590 P 20080103

2007-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2007-11-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-05-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUENZLE & TASIN S.P.A.

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-10-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI