Global patent index - EP 0972487 A1

EP 0972487 A1 2000-01-19 - Method for the operation of a dishwasher with program control

Title (en)

Method for the operation of a dishwasher with program control

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Geschirrspülers mit Steuerprogramm

Title (fr)

Procédé de fontionnement d'un lave-vaisselle avec programme de contrôle

Publication

EP 0972487 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99113042 A

Priority

DE 19831687 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a method for the operation of a dishwasher with program control, in which the program steps are variable depending on the degree of opaqueness of the washing solution. The cleaning effect is optimised with a minimum expenditure of time and energy in that a first program structure can be selected for easily cleaned domestic soiling and a second program structure can be selected for burned-on and/or dried-on domestic soiling, in that the degree of opaqueness of the washing solution is measured by means of an optical sensor according to transparency and foam formation, in that in the first program structure at least the washing duration is varied in the program steps and in that in the second program structure the washing solution is heated to a defined temperature, at least in pre-washing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/00 (2006.01); D06F 33/02 (2006.01); D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/004 (2013.01); A47L 15/0021 (2013.01); A47L 15/0044 (2013.01); A47L 15/0047 (2013.01); D06F 33/02 (2013.01); A47L 2401/10 (2013.01); A47L 2501/01 (2013.01); A47L 2501/30 (2013.01); D06F 2202/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972487 A1 20000119; EP 0972487 B1 20030305; DE 19831687 A1 20000120; ES 2193627 T3 20031101

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150701

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2193627

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69905658

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030410

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI