Global Patent Index - EP 0972503 A2

EP 0972503 A2 2000-01-19 - Pumping means particularly for whirlpool baths

Title (en)

Pumping means particularly for whirlpool baths

Title (de)

Fördereinrichtung vorzugsweise für eine Whirlpool-Badewanne

Title (fr)

Pompe notamment pour baignoire tourbillonnante

Publication

EP 0972503 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111620 A

Priority

DE 19831853 A

Abstract (en)

The feed device has an electric motor driving a rotor wheel (19) which extracts water from the interior of the bath via suction openings (11) in a suction rosette (42) , before injecting the water back into the bath as a jet via centrral discharge openings (3a), with an air channel (38) alowing air to be mixed with the injected water. The air channel contains a non-return device for blocking ingress of water when the rotor wheel is switched off.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Fördereinrichtung vorzugsweise für eine Whirlpool-Badewanne, die zum einen ein von einem Motor antreibbares Flügelrad (19) umfaßt, mittels dessen Wasser aus dem Wannenraum durch Ansaugöffnungen (11) in einer Ansaugrosette (1) in eine Kammer (42) angesaugt wird. Von dort aus wird das Wasser dann in einem Strahl durch in einem zentrischen Bereich liegende Austrittsöffnungen (3a) in den Wannenraum ausgestoßen. Außerdem ist wenigstens ein Luftkanal (38) vorgesehen, über den Luft dem Wasserstrahl beigemischt werden kann. Im Strömungsweg dieses wenigstens einen Luftkanals ist wenigstens ein Rückflußverhinderer derart angeordnet, daß ein Rückfluß von Wasser nach dem Abschalten des Flügelrads (19) bzw. des Gebläses in den Luftkanal verhindert wird. dies hat den Vorteil, daß sich Verschmutzungen in dem Luftkanalsystem vermeiden lassen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/6063 (2013.01); A61H 33/6047 (2013.01); A61H 33/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972503 A2 20000119; EP 0972503 A3 20000524; DE 19831853 A1 20000217; DE 19831853 C2 20001026

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050104

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANZ KALDEWEI GMBH & CO.KG

2001-03-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-03-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000429

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61H 33/00 A, 7F 04D 31/00 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI