Global Patent Index - EP 0972542 A1

EP 0972542 A1 2000-01-19 - Building emergency evacuation device

Title (en)

Building emergency evacuation device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Notevakuierung eines Gebäudes

Title (fr)

Dispotif d'evacuation d'urgence d'un edifice

Publication

EP 0972542 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98305569 A

Priority

EP 98305569 A

Abstract (en)

A building emergency evacuation device includes an upright post arranged adjacent to a building. The post has a lower end fixed to a base which is fixed to or at least partially embedded in the ground to firmly support the post in position. The post has a plurality of support bracket plates fixed thereto and radially extending therefrom. The support bracket plates are arranged along a helical path around the post to support thereon a helical chute which is sized to accommodate people to slide down therealong. The helical chute has a plurality of access passages extending therefrom to connect to each floor of the building so as to allow the residents of the building to get into and thus slide down along the chute. A top member is fixed to a top end of the post on which a plurality of water sprinklers are arranged to spray water down onto the chute for providing protection against for example a building fire and serving as a lubricant for helping people sliding down the chute. The chute has a plurality of guiding rods arranged between any two successive turns of the helical chute to prevent accidental fall-off of the people sliding down the chute. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972542 A1 20000119

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030411

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL PT

2000-09-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19980805;LT PAYMENT 19980805;LV PAYMENT 19980805;RO PAYMENT 19980805;SI PAYMENT 19980805

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL PT

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19980805;LT PAYMENT 19980805;LV PAYMENT 19980805;MK;RO PAYMENT 19980805;SI PAYMENT 19980805