Global patent index - EP 0972544 A1

EP 0972544 A1 2000-01-19 - Method of producing a snow sliding board

Title (en)

Method of producing a snow sliding board

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Schneegleitbretts

Title (fr)

Procédé de realisation d'un ski ou autre planche de glisse sur neige

Publication

EP 0972544 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420138 A

Priority

FR 9809322 A

Abstract (en)

The ski or snowboard has an upper external shell member (7) covering at least one reinforcing layer (8), and before the shell member is molded in place additional localized protective or decorative layers (10, 11) of metal, plastic, viscoelastic or elastic material are glued to it. Then, using a mold (21, 22) with a smooth inner surface, the upper shell member (7) is molded onto the reinforcing layer (8), at the same time compressing the protective/decorative layers (10) so that they lie flush with the surface of the finished ski.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'un ski, ou autre planche de glisse sur neige qui comporte, en surface, des éléments encastrés qui sont constitués par des éléments de couches additionnelles de protection et de décor, ces éléments étant à fleur de la surface de la planche de glisse. La feuille (7) de protection et de décor est posée à plat, avant mise au moule, et les éléments minces à encastrer (9, 10, 11) sont rapportés sur celle-ci par collage. Puis l'ensemble des éléments du ski est moulé classiquement, de sorte que la surface interne, uniformément lisse, du couvercle du moule vient presser sur les éléments additionnels (9, 10, Il) et par suite encastrer ceux-ci dans la feuille (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/003 (2013.01); A63C 5/126 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1043 (2013.01); Y10T 156/109 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972544 A1 20000119; EP 0972544 B1 20041201; AT 283722 T 20041215; DE 69922299 D1 20050105; DE 69922299 T2 20051124; FR 2781165 A1 20000121; FR 2781165 B1 20000825; US 6478917 B1 20021112

INPADOC legal status

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69922299

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-06-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060618

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-05-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69922299

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030507

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI