Global patent index - EP 0972546 A2

EP 0972546 A2 2000-01-19 - Device and method for processing a ski or a snowboard

Title (en)

Device and method for processing a ski or a snowboard

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bearbeitung eines Skis oder eines Snowboardes

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de traitement d'un ski ou d'un snowboard

Publication

EP 0972546 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112700 A

Priority

DE 19830251 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830251C1] The machine for grinding skis has a working tool carrier (30) movable along the skis. The tool carrier has at least two different tools (40a-c) carried on a common driven shaft (34) extending across the ski axis. The ski holder (20,21) is also adjustable laterally to bring the ski into contact with the different tools.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung eines Skis oder eines Snowboards, mit einem Werkzeugträger (30), der ein Bearbeitungswerkzeug (40, 51) aufnimmt, und einer Halteeinrichtung (20, 21) zum Halten des zu bearbeitenden Skis oder Snowboards, wobei der Werkzeugträger (30) in Längsrichtung des Skis verlagerbar angeordnet ist. Der Werkzeugträger (30) trägt zumindest zwei unterschiedliche Bearbeitungswerkzeuge (40a, 40b, 40c) auf einer ersten angetriebenen Welle (34), die quer zur Längsrichtung verläuft. Die Halteeinrichtung (20, 21) ist quer zur Längsrichtung verstellbar angeordnet, so daß der Ski mit jedem der Bearbeitungswerkzeuge (40) in Kontakt gebracht werden kann. Ferner betrifft die Erfindung ein Verfahren zur Bearbeitung eines Skis oder Snowboards. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4321449 A1

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830251 C1 19991118; EP 0972546 A2 20000119; EP 0972546 A3 20021218; JP 2000042164 A 20000215; US 6162115 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030616

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI