Global Patent Index - EP 0972580 A2

EP 0972580 A2 2000-01-19 - Method for presetting cold-forming installations

Title (en)

Method for presetting cold-forming installations

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Voreinstellen von Kaltverformungsanlagen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour préréglage d'installations de formage à froid

Publication

EP 0972580 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99110703 A

Priority

DE 19831480 A

Abstract (en)

The hardness of the product is measured shortly before its formation, and the result is used for correction of its hardening curve and the presetting of the cold-forming installation.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Voreinstellen von Kaltverformungsanlagen, wie Kaltwalzstraßen, Dressiergerüste, Streckbiegerichter, Richtmaschinen und andere. Die Genauigkeit des Presettings üblicher Kaltverformungsanlagen wird dadurch gesteigert, dass die Härte des zu verformenden Materials kurz vor dessen Kaltverformung gemessen und zur Korrektur seiner Verfestigungskurve und der darauf basierenden Voreinstellung der Kaltverformungsanlage verwendet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/22 (2006.01); B21B 37/58 (2006.01); B21D 1/00 (2006.01); B21B 1/28 (2006.01); B21B 1/36 (2006.01); B21B 38/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/58 (2013.01); B21B 1/28 (2013.01); B21B 1/36 (2013.01); B21B 38/105 (2013.01); B21B 2001/228 (2013.01); B21B 2265/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831480 C1 20000113; AT 301510 T 20050815; CA 2277550 A1 20000114; CA 2277550 C 20070925; EP 0972580 A2 20000119; EP 0972580 A3 20021211; EP 0972580 B1 20050810; ES 2245061 T3 20051216; JP 2000042602 A 20000215; JP 4390917 B2 20091224; US 6161406 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59912379

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912379

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245061 T3

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912379 P 20050915

2005-08-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990618

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI