Global patent index - EP 0972586 A2

EP 0972586 A2 2000-01-19 - Method of drive controlling a transfer press for big pieces and apparatus for executing the process

Title (en)

Method of drive controlling a transfer press for big pieces and apparatus for executing the process

Title (de)

Vefahren zur Steuerung des Antriebs einer Grossteilstufenpresse und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la commande d' actionnement d'une presse de transfert pour grandes pièces et dispositif pour réaliser ce procédé

Publication

EP 0972586 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111752 A

Priority

DE 19831623 A

Abstract (en)

The press (1) has runner rails on which transverse beams with suction pads (2) are arranged to pick up and transport the metal parts directly or via carriages. A horizontal movement of the beams results via a mechanical curve (3) drive with pushing levers (4), coupled to the press drive. Vertical movement of the beams is caused by an electric drive (5). The mechanical horizontal movement of the beams is at the same time superimposed with a variably controlled vertical movement and a pivotal movement about the longitudinal axis of the beam, caused by an electronically programmable electric drive. The electronically controlled vertical and/or pivotal movement of the beam is dependent on the geometry of the workpiece in the press. Independent claims also cover a conversion apparatus for the press.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Steuerung des Antriebs einer Großteilstufenpresse (GT-Presse) mit Saugerbalkentransfer vorgeschlagen, bei welcher zur Erzielung eines Höchstmaßes an Variabilität der Bewegungsabläufe zur Anpassung an verschiedensten Geometrien des Werkstücks eine Kombination von mechanisch und/oder elektronisch gesteuerten Bewegungen erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/05 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972586 A2 20000119; EP 0972586 A3 20010117; EP 0972586 B1 20030820; CN 1152757 C 20040609; CN 1252327 A 20000510; DE 19831623 A1 20000120; ES 2207075 T3 20040516

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120619

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-05-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906648

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110619

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120618

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110618

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110618

2012-02-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110627

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110519

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2207075

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906648

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020808

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI