Global Patent Index - EP 0972588 A3

EP 0972588 A3 2001-01-31 - Method for producing metal rings

Title (en)

Method for producing metal rings

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Blechringen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'anneaux métalliques

Publication

EP 0972588 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102001 A

Priority

DE 19831189 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972588A2] A continuous source material (3) is formed into rings (5) and cut to size. The ring ends (6,7) are butt welded, and the rings are finished by plastic forming at room temperature. The side walls (9,10) are parallel to each other. Rings are formed and cut by a roller and cutter machine, and the rings are cut individually. The source material is pre-formed and has an approx. oval cross section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 37/00; B21K 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 45/04 (2006.01); B21D 53/16 (2006.01); B21F 37/00 (2006.01); B21F 37/04 (2006.01); B21K 1/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 37/04 (2013.01); B21D 53/16 (2013.01); B21F 37/00 (2013.01); B21K 1/761 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972588 A2 20000119; EP 0972588 A3 20010131; BR 9902670 A 20000308; DE 19831189 A1 20000120; KR 20000011605 A 20000225

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010801

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI