Global patent index - EP 0972589 A3

EP 0972589 A3 2000-01-26 - Method for the manufacture of a compression fitting of metal

Title (en)

Method for the manufacture of a compression fitting of metal

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines verpressbaren Fittings oder Armatur aus Metall

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un raccord à compression en métal

Publication

EP 0972589 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250146 A

Priority

DE 19833769 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972589A2] The fitting is fabricated from a cast metal main body, which is connected to a standard metal plate connector. The end section (13) of the connector facing the main body is brought into contact with the molten bath used to produce the main body. The rest of the connector is sealed (12) against the molten bath. The connector is placed in the mold (9) before casting the main body. If a solderable material is used for the main body, a solder wire or paste is placed at the connection point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21K 1/16; F16L 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21K 1/16 (2006.01); F16L 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 13/142 (2013.01); B21K 1/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972589 A2 20000119; EP 0972589 A3 20000126; DE 19833769 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status

2000-12-20 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-11-29 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20000710

2000-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAPRESS GMBH & CO. KG

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI