Global patent index - EP 0972590 A1

EP 0972590 A1 2000-01-19 - Continuous casting mould

Title (en)

Continuous casting mould

Title (de)

Stranggiesskokille

Title (fr)

Lingotière de coulée continue

Publication

EP 0972590 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111052 A

Priority

DE 19831998 A

Abstract (en)

The rear sides (10) of the mold broadside walls (2) below the lowest melt level (8) are provided with a wall thickness increment (11) which is the greatest at the top and successively diminishes in the casting direction (6).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Stranggießkokille zum Herstellen von Brammen, die wassergekühlte Schmal- und Breitseitenwände aufweist, insbesondere zum Herstellen von Dünnbrammen, wobei dann in deren aus Kupferplatten bestehenden Breitseitenwänden einerseits innen, zwischen einem zu den beiden Schmalseiten hin jeweils parallel auslaufenden Bereich, ein Eingießtrichter ausgebildet ist und andererseits außen bzw. rückseitig Kühlnuten vorgesehen sind, wird die Oberflächenqualität des Dünnbrammenstranges verbessert, insbesondere das Auftreten von Längsrissen vermieden bzw. zumindest verringert, wenn die Rückseiten der Breitseitenwände ausgehend von unterhalb der tiefsten Badspiegellage durch eine dort größte, in Stranggießrichtung sich zunehmend verjüngende Wand-Aufpanzerung verstärkt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/055 (2006.01); B22D 11/059 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/059 (2013.01); B22D 11/0408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9526839 A1
  • [A] EP 0685279 A1
  • [AD] FLEMMING G ET AL: "WALZEN VON STRANGGEGOSSENEN VORBAENDERN UND ANLAGENTECHNISCHE KONSEQUENZEN FUER DEN BAU VON WARMBAND-PRODUKTIONSANLAGEN. ROLLING OF CONTINUOUSLY CAST STRIPS AND THE TECHNICAL CONSEQUENCES WITH RESPECT TO THE DESIGN OF HOT STRIP PRODUCTION PLANTS" STAHL UND EISEN, Bd. 108, Nr. 3, 8. Februar 1988 (1988-02-08), Seiten 99-109, XP002014244 ISSN: 0340-4803

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972590 A1 20000119; EP 0972590 B1 20040331; AT 262993 T 20040415; DE 19831998 A1 20000120; JP 2000033461 A 20000202; JP 4836303 B2 20111214; US 6474401 B1 20021105

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130614

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130614

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130614

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59908998

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130614

2014-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 262993

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-03-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59908998

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040506

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990712

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI