Global patent index - EP 0972592 A1

EP 0972592 A1 2000-01-19 - Method and horizontal continuous casting machine for the production of a coilable metal strip

Title (en)

Method and horizontal continuous casting machine for the production of a coilable metal strip

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines zu einem Coil wickelbaren Metallbandes und Horizontal-Bandgiessanlage zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé dispositif de coulée continue horizontale pour la fabrication des bandes métaliques enroulables

Publication

EP 0972592 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112875 A

Priority

DE 19831111 A

Abstract (en)

Metal strip (4) in horizontal strip casting installation (1) is extracted from mold (3) by the rolls (7) of extraction unit (6) in a cycle with a forward step and a shorter reverse step. It is fed via a shears unit (10) to coiling section (16) and wound into coil (21). At least one coiling roll (19) of coiling section (16) and at least one extraction roll (7) of unit (6) are driven in synchronism. An Independent claim is also included for an installation for carrying out the above method which incorporates a programmable control system (9) governing the drives of the extraction and coiling rolls (7, 19).

Abstract (de)

Die Horizontal-Bandgießanlage (1) zur Erzeugung eines zu einem Coil (21) wickelbaren Metallbands (4) weist eine im Abstand zu einer einem Ofen (2) zugeordneten Kokille (3) örtlich fixierte Abzieheinheit (6) mit mehreren Abziehrollen (7), eine in Längsrichtung des von der Abzieheinheit (6) aus der Kokille (3) gezogenen Metallbands (4) verlagerbare Bandtrenneinheit (10) sowie eine ebenfalls in dieser Längsrichtung verlagerbare Einrolleinheit (16) mit Wickelrollen (19) auf. Wenigstens eine Abziehrolle (7) und eine Wickelrolle (19) sind synchron angetrieben und ihre Antriebe über eine speicherprogrammierbare Steuerung (9) miteinander gekoppelt. Zwischen der Abzieheinheit (6) und der Einrolleinheit (16) ist die Bandtrenneinheit (10) angeordnet, die ebenfalls mit der speicherprogrammierbaren Steuerung (9) gekoppelt ist und nur dann durch das Metallband (4) bewegt wird, wenn es getrennt werden soll. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/128; B22D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/128 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/1284 (2013.01); B22D 11/0694 (2013.01); B21B 1/46 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49991 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831111 A1 20000113; AT 244084 T 20030715; CN 1106896 C 20030430; CN 1241463 A 20000119; DK 0972592 T3 20031027; DK 0972592 T4 20070115; EP 0972592 A1 20000119; EP 0972592 B1 20030702; EP 0972592 B2 20060906; ES 2199504 T3 20040216; ES 2199504 T5 20070501; HU 222465 B1 20030728; HU 9902347 A2 20000228; HU 9902347 A3 20000529; HU 9902347 D0 19990928; KR 100611081 B1 20060810; KR 20000011607 A 20000225; PL 190054 B1 20051031; PT 972592 E 20031128; TW 487609 B 20020521; US 6305068 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 244084

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20140219

2013-11-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20131029

2013-11-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20131029

2013-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20131004

2013-09-04 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-09-04 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-08-27 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Owner name: KME GERMANY AG & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20130821

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: KME GERMANY AG, DE

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59906163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: KME GERMANY AG & CO. KG, 49074 OSNABRUECK, DE

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59906163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PIETRZYKOWSKI, ANJA, DE

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-01-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59906163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PIETRZYKOWSKI, ANJA, DE

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2007-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: KME GERMANY AG

- Free Format Text: KM EUROPA METAL AG#KLOSTERSTRASSE 29#49074 OSNABRUECK (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KME GERMANY AG#KLOSTERSTRASSE 29#49074 OSNABRUECK (DE)

2007-05-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Date of Ref Document: 20061204

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2007-02-23 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-01-15 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2006-12-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20060404134

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2006-12-05 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2006-12-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2006-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-10-11 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2006-09-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-09-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MESSINGWERK PLETTENBERG HERFELD GMBH & CO. KG

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SMS MEER GMBH DEMAG TECHNICA

2004-05-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MESSINGWERK PLETTENBERG HERFELD GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-05-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS MEER GMBHDEMAG TECHNICA

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2199504

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030403745

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-10-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59906163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030807

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-07-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI