Global patent index - EP 0972618 A2

EP 0972618 A2 2000-01-19 - Cutting machine for cutting stacked sheet material

Title (en)

Cutting machine for cutting stacked sheet material

Title (de)

Schneidmaschine zum Schneiden von gestapeltem, blattförmigem Gut

Title (fr)

Machine de coupe pour matériaux en feuilles empilées

Publication

EP 0972618 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112628 A

Priority

DE 19831919 A

Abstract (en)

The cutting machine has an additional display (12) designed as a changeable touch screen located near the display (11), so that with this, scanning symbols (17) and-or operating element symbols (18) and-or by means of a finger operated computer mouse (19) are indictable. The control of the auxiliary display and the touch matrix, results by the operator computer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schneidmaschine zum Schneiden von gestapeltem, blattförmigem Gut. Sie weist ein Tisch zur Aufnahme des Gutes, ein Messer zum Schneiden des Gutes, einen auf das zu schneidende Gut absenkbaren Preßbalken und einen Vorschubsattel zum Verschieben des Gutes in Richtung des Messers auf. Es ist eine Tastatur (16) mit Zahlen, Buchstaben, Symbolen oder dergleichen zum Bedienen der Schneidmaschine sowie ein Bedienrechner für die Auswertung der Tastatureingabe, ferner ein Display (11) für die Anzeige des Zustands der Maschine und/oder des Ablaufes des Schneidprogrammes vorgesehen. Erfindungsgemäß weist die Schneidmaschine örtlich neben dem Display (11) ein zusätzliches als wandelbares Touchscreen ausgebildetes Display (2) auf, mit dem Tastensymbol (17) und/oder Symbole für Bedienelemente und/oder eine mittels Finger betätigbare Computer-Maus darstellbar sind. Die Steuerung des zusätzlichen Displays und der Touchmatrix erfolgt durch den Bedienrechner. Eine derart ausgebildete Schneidmaschine ermöglicht eine optimale Bedienung der Maschine sowie optimale Bedienerführung durch die Maschine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/00 (2006.01); B26D 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/00 (2013.01); B26D 1/08 (2013.01); B26D 7/016 (2013.01); B26D 7/025 (2013.01); Y10T 83/18 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2037 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972618 A2 20000119; EP 0972618 A3 20010321; JP 2000094392 A 20000404; US 2002000145 A1 20020103

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020823

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI