Global Patent Index - EP 0972618 A3

EP 0972618 A3 2001-03-21 - Cutting machine for cutting stacked sheet material

Title (en)

Cutting machine for cutting stacked sheet material

Title (de)

Schneidmaschine zum Schneiden von gestapeltem, blattförmigem Gut

Title (fr)

Machine de coupe pour matériaux en feuilles empilées

Publication

EP 0972618 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112628 A

Priority

DE 19831919 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972618A2] The cutting machine has an additional display (12) designed as a changeable touch screen located near the display (11), so that with this, scanning symbols (17) and-or operating element symbols (18) and-or by means of a finger operated computer mouse (19) are indictable. The control of the auxiliary display and the touch matrix, results by the operator computer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/00 (2006.01); B26D 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/00 (2013.01); B26D 1/08 (2013.01); B26D 7/016 (2013.01); B26D 7/025 (2013.01); Y10T 83/18 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2037 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5056029 A 19911008 - CANNON THOMAS G [US]
  • [A] US 5311567 A 19940510 - PELLEGRINO ANTHONY J [US], et al
  • [DA] DE 9408919 U1 19941222 - PERFECTA SCHNEIDEMASCHINENWERK [DE]
  • [Y] "EXTERNE PROGRAMMIERUNG VON SCHNEIDEMASCHINEN", PAPIER + KUNSTSTOFF VERARBEITER,DE,DEUTSCHE FACHVERLAG. FRANKFURT, vol. 32, no. 9, 1 September 1997 (1997-09-01), pages 36, XP000703387, ISSN: 0048-2897

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972618 A2 20000119; EP 0972618 A3 20010321; JP 2000094392 A 20000404; US 2002000145 A1 20020103

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020823

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI