Global patent index - EP 0972631 A1

EP 0972631 A1 2000-01-19 - Hydraulic drive for a press

Title (en)

Hydraulic drive for a press

Title (de)

Hydraulischer Antrieb für eine Presse

Title (fr)

Entraînement hydraulique pour une presse

Publication

EP 0972631 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111751 A

Priority

DE 19831624 A

Abstract (en)

Press operation can be switched from 'simulation' with high plunger speed and low number of strokes, to 'production' with low speed and higher number of strokes. For this purpose, the pressure accumulator drive for a cylinder-piston unit (2) has an associated hydraulic transformer unit (27). This consists of a first hydraulic unit (28), formed as angle-adjustable hydraulic motor (29), and a second hydraulic unit (36), formed as an adjustable hydraulic pump, which is mechanically connected to the first. During simulation operation, the hydraulic accumulator (8) of the pump unit serves as drive for the first hydraulic unit.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein hydraulischer Antrieb für eine Presse und insbesondere für eine Presse zur Simulation der Betriebsbedingungen von mechanischen GT-Pressen oder dergleichen vorgeschlagen. Um eine derartige hydraulische Simulationspresse auch für Null-Serien oder Kleinserien bei erheblicher Verbesserung des Wirkungsgrades verfügbar zu machen, wird ein sogenannter hydraulischer Transformator dem Antrieb zugeordnet, der aus schwenkwinkelverstellbaren Hydraulikeinrichtungen besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 1/32; B30B 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/16 (2006.01); B30B 15/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/24 (2013.01); B30B 15/161 (2013.01); B30B 15/163 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972631 A1 20000119; EP 0972631 B1 20030326; DE 19831624 A1 20000120; US 6370873 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2004-05-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-02-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-06-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904695

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2003-03-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020524

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT SE

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI