Global Patent Index - EP 0972648 A2

EP 0972648 A2 2000-01-19 - Ink jet recording apparatus

Title (en)

Ink jet recording apparatus

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0972648 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99113679 A

Priority

JP 20100998 A

Abstract (en)

To propose an ink-jet recording apparatus having a small-sized compact driving mechanism for driving an ink suction pump, an elastic blade for wiping a recording head, and a locking arm for locking a carriage. An ink suction pump 8, a locking arm for locking a carriage, and an elastic blade for wiping a recording head are driven by a driving mechanism for common use. The driving mechanism transmits the torque of a single motor via a driving gear to the ink suction pump. Moreover, the driving mechanism also converts the rotary motion into the locking movement of the elastic blade via a rotary cam plate frictionally engaging with the driving gear and further converts the locking movement of the elastic blade to the locking movement of the locking arm. The ink-jet recording apparatus can be made small-sized and compact by driving each driven portion using the driving mechanism for common use. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 29/393

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2013.01); B41J 2/16532 (2013.01); B41J 2/17596 (2013.01); B41J 23/025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972648 A2 20000119; EP 0972648 A3 20000705; EP 0972648 B1 20050928; CN 1161236 C 20040811; CN 1241490 A 20000119; DE 69927443 D1 20060209; DE 69927443 T2 20060629; HK 1023966 A1 20050324; US 2001028373 A1 20011011; US 6220692 B1 20010424; US 6554393 B2 20030429

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150715

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150715

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150715

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69927443

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140715

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140709

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140708

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140709

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION

- Free text: SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION#4-1, NISHI-SHINJUKU 2-CHOME SHINJUKU-KU,#TOKYO 163-0811 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION#4-1, NISHI-SHINJUKU 2-CHOME SHINJUKU-KU,#TOKYO 163-0811 (JP)

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927443 P 20060209

2005-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-09-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040116

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 29/393 A, 7B 41J 2/165 B, 7B 41J 23/02 B

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI