Global Patent Index - EP 0972654 A1

EP 0972654 A1 2000-01-19 - INK APPLICATOR, INK BACKFLOW PREVENTION MECHANISM OF INK APPLICATOR, AND A PEN TIP

Title (en)

INK APPLICATOR, INK BACKFLOW PREVENTION MECHANISM OF INK APPLICATOR, AND A PEN TIP

Title (de)

TINTENAUFTRAGUNGSGERÄT, TINTENRÜCKFLUSSVERHINDERUNG DAFÜR UND FILZSCHREIBER

Title (fr)

APPLICATEUR D'ENCRE, MECANISME DE PREVENTION DU RETOUR D'ENCRE DE CET APPLICATEUR D'ENCRE ET POINTE DE PLUME

Publication

EP 0972654 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98957150 A

Priority

  • JP 9805456 W
  • JP 34993997 A

Abstract (en)

An applicator that makes it unlikely for an ink, particularly water-based or alcohol solvent ink, to become blurred and assures smooth writing, including an ink reservoir accommodating an ink, a penpoint tip for ink application, and a valve mechanism, wherein the valve mechanism has an axially movable valve body, a valve seat situated on the side of the ink reservoir with respect to the valve body, and a valve support situated on the side of the tip with respect to the valve body; the valve support can anchor the valve body and has an interstice between it and the valve body through which the ink passes; when the tip is disposed upward, the valve body contacts the valve seat to prevent backflow of ink from the tip toward the ink reservoir; and when the tip is disposed downward, the valve body contacts the valve support, allowing the ink to flow through the interstice toward the tip; characterized in that a portion of the valve body that contacts the valve support is formed spherical, and the projected area of the interstice not covered by the valve body produced by projecting the valve body and the interstice onto a plane perpendicular to the axis is 0.035 mm<2> or more. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43K 7/08; B05C 17/00; B43K 1/08; B43K 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43K 7/02 (2006.01); B43K 5/18 (2006.01); B43K 7/08 (2006.01); B43K 8/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43K 5/1836 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972654 A1 20000119; EP 0972654 A4 20031126; EP 0972654 B1 20050914; AU 2243599 A 19990616; DE 69831561 D1 20051020; DE 69831561 T2 20060614; JP 4028886 B2 20071226; JP H11165487 A 19990622; WO 9928139 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69831561

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131202

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69831561 P 20051020

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040122

2003-11-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 43K 7/08 A

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 43K 7/02 B

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 43K 1/08 B

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 17/00 B

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 43K 5/18 B

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990828

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB