Global patent index - EP 0972656 A2

EP 0972656 A2 2000-01-19 - Process for local selective coating of a transparent support plate with a metallic film by etching, layered composite obtainable by this process and embossed sheet used in the process

Title (en)

Process for local selective coating of a transparent support plate with a metallic film by etching, layered composite obtainable by this process and embossed sheet used in the process

Title (de)

Verfahren zum selektiven, bereichsweisen Beschichten einer transparenten Trägerplatte mit einer metallischen Wirkschicht unter Verwendung eines Ätzverfahrens sowie entsprechend herstellbare Schichtabfolge und dazu verwendbare Konterprägefolie

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le revêtement local et sélectif d'une plaque support transparente avec une couche métallique par décapage, composite à plusieurs couches réalisable par ce procédé et feuille estampée utilisée dans le procédé

Publication

EP 0972656 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113870 A

Priority

DE 19831796 A

Abstract (en)

By use of a patterning foil, the metal layer is applied to the transparent carrier plate (10) at least in a region incorporating areas to be coated with such a layer. A cover in the form of a color layer (12) is then applied directly to this metal layer. The metal layer (14) is then etched away only in areas not covered by the color layer. Independent claims are also included for a layer sequence thus produced, and a patterning foil used for its production. Preferred Features: The patterning foil consisting of a carrier foil, a separation layer, a patterned metal layer and an adhesive layer is applied to the carrier plate with use of pressure and heat. The metal layer is transferred to the carrier plate substantially without residues of the separation layer. The carrier foil together with the separation layer is removed from the metal layer. Aluminum and/or at least one aluminum alloy is/are used for production of the metal layer, preferably by vapor deposition onto the carrier foil of the patterning foil. The metal layer is selectively etched away by iron trichloride. An additional color layer is applied at least to parts of the carrier plate before the metal layer is applied. Further color layers can be applied to the carrier plate after the etching process. The additional color layer is preferably yellow. The color layers are chosen to produce required tints and translucence. The carrier plate is a clear acryl glass plate.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum selektiven, bereichsweisen Beschichten einer transparenten Trägerplatte mit einer metallischen Wirkschicht unter Verwendung eines Ätzverfahrens, bei dem auf die Trägerplatte die metallische Wirkschicht und in mit der metallischen Wirkschicht zu beschichtenden Bereichen eine Abdeckschicht aufgebracht werden, woraufhin die metallische Wirkschicht in den nicht von der Abdeckschicht abgedeckten Bereichen weggeätzt wird, wobei die metallische Wirkschicht über eine Konterprägefolie zumindest in einem Gebiet, das die mit der metallischen Wirkschicht zu beschichtenden Bereiche umfaßt, vollflächig auf die Trägerplatte aufgeprägt wird, die Abdeckschicht in Form einer ersten Farbschicht direkt auf die metallische Wirkschicht, auf der der Trägerplatte abgewandten Seite der metallischen Wirkschicht, aufgebracht wird, und im wesentlichen nur die metallische Wirkschicht in den nicht von der Abdeckschicht abgedeckten Bereichen weggeätzt wird; sowie eine danach herstellbare Schichtabfolge und eine dazu verwendbare Konterprägefolie. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 1/22; B44C 1/14; C23F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/14 (2006.01); B44C 1/22 (2006.01); C23F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 1/02 (2013.01); B44C 1/14 (2013.01); B44C 1/227 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972656 A2 20000119; EP 0972656 A3 20000823; EP 0972656 B1 20030319; AT 234738 T 20030415; DE 19831796 A1 20000127; DE 19831796 C2 20000824; ES 2195482 T3 20031201

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070715

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 07

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060717

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060717

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060715

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-07-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060716

2006-07-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060715

2005-08-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050818

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050708

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-07-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050706

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-07-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050703

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRITZ BORSI K.G.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 0972656E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-07-15 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-07-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-06-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-06-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-05-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59904595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030424

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR LOCAL SELECTIVE COATING OF A TRANSPARENT SUPPORT PLATE WITH A METALLIC FILM BY ETCHING,LAYERED COMPOSITE OBTAINABLE BY THIS PROCESS AND USE OF AN EMBOSSED SHEET IN THE PROCESS

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI