Global patent index - EP 0972706 A1

EP 0972706 A1 2000-01-19 - Packaging machine for wrapping a product

Title (en)

Packaging machine for wrapping a product

Title (de)

Verpackungsmaschine zum Einwickeln eines Gegenstandes

Title (fr)

Machine d'emballage pour envelopper un article

Publication

EP 0972706 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99113340 A

Priority

IT BO980427 A

Abstract (en)

A packing machine (1) wherein a conveying head (39) feeds a product (2) to a wrapping head (6) in which a respective sheet (3) of wrapping material is folded into a U about the product (2) so as to have a pair of wings (14, 15) facing each other and projecting transversely from the product (2); and a movable folding device (18) carried by the conveying head (39) folds a first wing (14) of the pair of wings (14, 15) through 90 DEG onto the product (2) once the product (2) is supplied to the wrapping head (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/22; B65B 11/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/30 (2006.01); B65B 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/30 (2013.01); B65B 19/226 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972706 A1 20000119; IT 1304033 B1 20010302; IT BO980427 A1 20000114; RU 2228887 C2 20040520; US 2001047639 A1 20011206

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI