Global Patent Index - EP 0972707 A1

EP 0972707 A1 2000-01-19 - Method and apparatus for packaging a roll of web material

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for packaging a roll of web material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken einer Materialbahnrolle

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer un rouleau de matériau en bande

Publication

EP 0972707 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112150 A

Priority

DE 19831277 A

Abstract (en)

An adhesive is applied to the circumference of the material roll (2) so that the packaging material web (3) is releasably secured to the roll. At least the start of the packaging material web is urged against the outside of the material roll and then this roll is rotated. An Independent claim is also included for the packaging machine, containing a combination of an adhesive dispenser (16) and a press nip arrangement (3,4).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Verpacken einer Materialbahnrolle (2) angegeben, bei denen eine Verpackungsbahn (3) zumindest mit ihrem Anfang in Anlage am Umfang der Materialbahnrolle (2) gehalten und die Materialbahnrolle (2) mit Hilfe eines Rotationsantriebs (6) gedreht wird. Hierbei möchte man die Materialbahnrolle (2) auf einfache Weise verpacken, ohne ihre Oberfläche zu beschädigen, wobei die Beschädigung auch beim Auspacken erfolgen kann. Dazu wird die Verpackungsbahn (3) mit Hilfe eines Haftklebers (31) mit dem Umfang der Materialbahnrolle (2) lösbar verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19535746 C2 19980528 - VOITH SULZER FINISHING GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0849178 A1 19980624 - VOITH SULZER FINISHING GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972707 A1 20000119; EP 0972707 B1 20021002; DE 19831277 A1 20000120; US 6568152 B1 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-20 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060815

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2003-11-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER, INC.

2003-09-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER, INC.

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-06-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030624

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902907 20021107

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI LI NL

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FI LI NL

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991028

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI LI NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI