Global Patent Index - EP 0972711 A2

EP 0972711 A2 2000-01-19 - Label printer

Title (en)

Label printer

Title (de)

Etikettendrucker

Title (fr)

Imprimante d'étiquettes

Publication

EP 0972711 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202303 A

Priority

  • US 9323898 P
  • US 34527499 A

Abstract (en)

An imaging forming device for separating a printable medium (10) from a protective backing of a continuous strip (12) attached thereto, the imaging forming device includes a stepped stripper roller shaft (38) encircled by a roller sleeve (42) adapted to press a platen (22) of the device wherein the imaging forming device causes the continuous strip (12) to pass over a stripper bar (28) and directs the protective backing to move under the stripper bar (28) and between the platen and the roller sleeve while the printable medium continuously moves outward of the device from over the stripper bar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 11/02 (2013.01); B65C 11/0289 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972711 A2 20000119; EP 0972711 A3 20000510; EP 0972711 B1 20031001; DE 69911694 D1 20031106; DE 69911694 T2 20040805

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070713

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070713

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911694 P 20031106

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ENGEL, JAMES WILLIAM

2003-09-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOMASIK, JOHN

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZIH CORP.

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELTRON INTERNATIONAL, INC.

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI