Global Patent Index - EP 0972719 A1

EP 0972719 A1 2000-01-19 - Easy opening package

Title (en)

Easy opening package

Title (de)

Leicht zu öffnende Verpackung

Title (fr)

Emballage facile à ouvrir

Publication

EP 0972719 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98305604 A

Priority

EP 98305604 A

Abstract (en)

A package comprises a sealed bag (1; 31; 41; 61; 71; 81; 91; 101) which is formed from impermeable sheet material having an inner surface and an outer surface. The bag (1; 31; 41; 61; 71; 81; 91; 101) defines an interior for reception of the package contents and has a closed bottom end (6; -) and an openable end longitudinally separated from the closed bottom end (6; -). The interior of the bag (1; 31; 41; 61; 71; 81; 91; 101) is closed at the openable end by a peelable seal (10; 47) extending substantially transversely across the bag (1; 31; 41; 61; 71; 81; 91; 101) and formed by peelably sealing an inner surface of a first portion of the sheet material to an inner surface of a second portion of the sheet material. Moreover the bag (1; 31; 41; 61; 71; 81; 91; 101) is provided with first and second tabs (23, 24; 50, 51; 72, 73; 82, 83; 92, 93; 102, 103) exterior to the peelable seal (10; 47) and formed integrally with the first and second portions respectively. The first and second tabs (23, 24; 50, 51; 72, 73; 82, 83; 92, 93; 102, 103) are each further provided with digital grip enhancement means (25; 32; 52; 62) to enhance gripping of the first tab (23; 50; 72; 82; 92; 102) between a thumb and an opposed finger of one hand of a person and gripping of the second tab (24; 51; 73; 83; 93; 103) between a corresponding thumb and opposed finger of the other hand of the person thereby to facilitate opening of the package. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/58; B65D 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/00 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 75/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5855 (2013.01); B65D 33/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972719 A1 20000119; CA 2277588 A1 20000114

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020531

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI