Global Patent Index - EP 0972720 A3

EP 0972720 A3 2000-07-05 - Product tray

Title (en)

Product tray

Title (de)

Verpackungsschale

Title (fr)

Plateau pour produits alimentaires

Publication

EP 0972720 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304130 A

Priority

GB 9815296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972720A2] A container (1) for use in the packaging of a product, such as a fresh meat product, with associated wrapping, comprising means (9) arranged to direct any liquid seeping or otherwise being released from the product when located upon the container (1), to a predetermined area (2, 6) of the interior surface of the base of the container (1). The underside surface of the base of the container (1) includes a recess (6') in which any excess wrapping can be at least partially accommodated. The container (1) further comprises means (10) arranged to engage a product packaged upon the container (1), to retain the product in position with respect to the container (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972720 A2 20000119; EP 0972720 A3 20000705; GB 2339567 A 20000202; GB 2339567 B 20030219; GB 9815296 D0 19980909

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030812

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020417

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI