Global patent index - EP 0972735 A2

EP 0972735 A2 2000-01-19 - Rectangular spinning can

Title (en)

Rectangular spinning can

Title (de)

Rechteckspinnkanne

Title (fr)

Pot de filature rectangulaire

Publication

EP 0972735 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112626 A

Priority

DE 19831905 A

Abstract (en)

The rectangular sliver can has a bottom buffer ring to provide an impact surface (13). The buffer is shaped to taper in the form of a trapezoid towards the smaller can side (16). A recess is provided in the end wall of the can for a code carrier and a shaped end wall (5) to follow the shape of the deposited sliver coils (8).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine zur Aufnahme von Faserband vorgesehene Rechteckspinnkanne (2) mit am unteren Kannenrand rundum vorgesehener Prallfläche (13) beschrieben. Um zu erreichen, daß die Rechteckkanne (2) sich beim Einschieben in einen Spalt zwischen zwei Kannen selbsttätig zentriert, wird die Prallfläche (13) an den Stirnwänden (5) konisch zugespitzt bzw. verjüngt ausgebildet. Dabei kann in einem abgestumpften Konus, der der jeweiligen Stirnwand vorgelagert wird, eine Mulde (18) entstehen, die zum Eingreifen eines Kannenmanipulators geeignet ist. In oder in unmittelbarer Nachbarschaft der Mulde kann ein mit einem Codeleser des Kannenmanipulators verbundener Codeträger vorgesehen werden. Die Form der Stirnwände kann, z.B. in die Mulde hinein, der Ablageform (9) des Faserbandes (8) angepaßt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/16; B65H 67/04; B65H 67/06; D01H 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/04 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01); B65H 75/16 (2006.01); B65H 75/18 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/185 (2013.01); B65H 67/0428 (2013.01); B65H 67/063 (2013.01); B65H 75/16 (2013.01); B65H 75/182 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972735 A2 20000119; EP 0972735 A3 20000920; DE 19831905 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status

2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI