Global patent index - EP 0972735 A3

EP 0972735 A3 2000-09-20 - Rectangular spinning can

Title (en)

Rectangular spinning can

Title (de)

Rechteckspinnkanne

Title (fr)

Pot de filature rectangulaire

Publication

EP 0972735 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112626 A

Priority

DE 19831905 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972735A2] The rectangular sliver can has a bottom buffer ring to provide an impact surface (13). The buffer is shaped to taper in the form of a trapezoid towards the smaller can side (16). A recess is provided in the end wall of the can for a code carrier and a shaped end wall (5) to follow the shape of the deposited sliver coils (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/16; B65H 67/04; B65H 67/06; D01H 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/04 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01); B65H 75/16 (2006.01); B65H 75/18 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/185 (2013.01); B65H 67/0428 (2013.01); B65H 67/063 (2013.01); B65H 75/16 (2013.01); B65H 75/182 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972735 A2 20000119; EP 0972735 A3 20000920; DE 19831905 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status

2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI