Global Patent Index - EP 0972739 A1

EP 0972739 A1 2000-01-19 - Inclined arrangement for cable elevator drive

Title (en)

Inclined arrangement for cable elevator drive

Title (de)

Schräganordnung eines Seilaufzugsantriebes

Title (fr)

Disposition inclinée de la machinerie d'un ascenseur à câbles

Publication

EP 0972739 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112634 A

Priority

  • EP 99112634 A
  • EP 98810662 A

Abstract (en)

The drive mechanism is pitched at an angle respect to the vertical axis passing through it. The drive mechanism comprises a gearing (2) with a drive plate (6), a motor (1), a brake mechanism (3-5) and cables (18) that extend around the drive plate and are attached to the lift cabin and counterweight. The motor is located in the top of the drive mechanism, facing upwards.

Abstract (de)

Dieser Seilaufzug weist einen für den Einbau in einem Schacht vorgesehen Aufzugsantrieb auf, bestehend aus einem Getriebe (2) mit Treibscheibe (6), einem nach oben gerichteten, auf dem Getriebe (2) angeordneten Motor (1), einer Bremse (3, 4, 5) und über die Treibscheibe (6) geschlungenen Tragorganen (18) für die Vertikalbewegung einer Aufzugskabine mit einem Gegengewicht. Bedingt durch die knappen Platzverhältnisse im Aufzugsschacht soll der Aufzugsantrieb möglichst wenig Grundfläche beanspruchen. Zu diesem Zweck werden Motor (1) und Getriebe (2) um einen Winkel () abweichend von der Vertikalen schräg gestellt. Bei dieser etwas geneigten Anordnung überragt kein Teil des Motors (1) die seitliche Ausdehnung des Getriebes (2). Ferner ist die Bremse (3, 4, 5) Bestandteil des Getriebes (2) und mit diesem unlösbar wirkverbunden, was ein problemloses An- und Abbauen des Motors (1) vom Getriebe (2) ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/04; B66B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0045 (2013.01); B66B 11/0446 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972739 A1 20000119; DE 29924339 U1 20021002; DK 1029822 T3 20040216; EP 1029822 A1 20000823; EP 1029822 B1 20031029; EP 1048603 A1 20001102; EP 1048603 B1 20030917; EP 1215157 A1 20020619; EP 1215157 B1 20050330; EP 1215158 A1 20020619; EP 1215158 B1 20041006; EP 1249424 A1 20021016; EP 1249424 B1 20030917

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025761

2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020326

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI