Global Patent Index - EP 0972740 B1

EP 0972740 B1 2002-12-04 - Guiding device

Title (en)

Guiding device

Title (de)

Führungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage

Publication

EP 0972740 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112242 A

Priority

DE 29812657 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0972740A2] Two guide rollers (30,40) are held facing each other by a bracket (20) near the flanks of the crane rail (50). The bracket is movable across the longitudinal axis of the crane-rail and can be fixed in position. The guide (1) has two facing piston-cylinder drive mechanisms (15,16) in the form of hydraulic cylinders operating the bracket and each containing at least one valve (61,62;71,72) and power supply (80). The piston cylinder drive mechanism and valves are contained in a housing (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 9/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29812657 U1 19981105; AT 228964 T 20021215; EP 0972740 A2 20000119; EP 0972740 A3 20010314; EP 0972740 B1 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903625

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120615

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040625

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030603

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903625 20030116

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228964 T 20021215

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI