Global patent index - EP 0972742 A2

EP 0972742 A2 2000-01-19 - Lifting platform for vehicles with two tracks

Title (en)

Lifting platform for vehicles with two tracks

Title (de)

Hebebühne für zweispurige Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Plate-forme de levage pour véhicules à deux voies

Publication

EP 0972742 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99109221 A

Priority

DE 29812459 U

Abstract (en)

The lifting platform consists of two horizontal carriers with resting elements for the wheels. There are lifting elements for the synchronous raising and lowering of the carriers. There is a raising and lowering floor leveller composed of plate elements to cover the foundation cavity. An axle lift is fitted which can travel in rails between the carriers. The strip foundation includes a cavity (30) which at least partly receives the lowered axle lift (13). The floor leveller (25-31) is arranged to cover this cavity too when the carriers (5,6) are raised.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist eine Hebebühne für zweispurige Fahrzeuge, bestehend aus zwei horizontalen Fahrträgern (5, 6) mit Aufstandselementen (8) für die Fahrzeugräder, Hubelementen (10, 11) zum synchronen Anheben und Absenken der Fahrträger (5, 6), einem heb- und senkbaren Bodenausgleich aus tragfähigen trittsicheren Plattenelementen (25, 26), die bei angehobenen Fahrträgern deren Einsenkung bzw. Freiraum im Fundament abdecken, und einem zwischen den beiden Fahrträgern in Längsschienen verfahrbaren Achslift (13). Um auch bei aus- und eingefahrener Hebebühne nicht nur die Fahrträger (5, 6), sondern auch den Achslift (13) vollständig abzudecken, weist das Streifenfundament einen Freiraum (30) zur zumindest teilweisen Aufnahme des abgesenkten Achsliftes (13) auf und der Bodenausgleich (25, 26, 31) ist zur Abdeckung auch dieses Freiraums (30) bei angehobenen Fahrträgern (5, 6) ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 7/20; B66F 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/28 (2006.01); B66F 7/16 (2006.01); B66F 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29812459 U1 19980910; EP 0972742 A2 20000119; EP 0972742 A3 20020320; JP 2000177999 A 20000627; US 6257371 B1 20010710

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031015

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI