Global Patent Index - EP 0972743 A1

EP 0972743 A1 2000-01-19 - Product series of trailer mounted aerial work platforms

Title (en)

Product series of trailer mounted aerial work platforms

Title (de)

Produktserie von auf Anhänger montierten Arbeitshebebühnen

Title (fr)

Séries de produit des plate-formes de travail montées sur remorque

Publication

EP 0972743 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99660074 A

Priority

FI 980337 U

Abstract (en)

The passenger hoist of the product series is implemented with modules so that the hoist construction comprises a boom module (3) and a base module (1), which are combined with a turning device module of the desired type (2, 10, 11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 11/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972743 A1 20000119; EP 0972743 B1 20030723; AT 245598 T 20030815; DE 69909685 D1 20030828; DE 69909685 T2 20040603; DK 0972743 T3 20031117; FI 3687 U1 19981026; FI 980337 U0 19980713

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090422

2009-09-30 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090422

2009-05-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TEUPEN MASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20040423

2009-04-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: B. TEUPEN MASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20040423

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DINOLIFT OY

2004-06-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: B. TEUPEN MASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-12-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-11-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031103

2003-10-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-10-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909685 P 20030828

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRODUCT SERIES OF TRAILER MOUNTED AERIAL WORK PLATFORMS

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011228

2000-11-02 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990506

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000316;LT PAYMENT 20000316;LV PAYMENT 20000316;MK PAYMENT 20000316;RO PAYMENT 20000316;SI PAYMENT 20000316

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI