Global Patent Index - EP 0972745 A1

EP 0972745 A1 2000-01-19 - Locking device for a dispenser head

Title (en)

Locking device for a dispenser head

Title (de)

Verriegelungseinrichtung für einen Zapfkopf

Title (fr)

Verrouillage pour une tête de distribution

Publication

EP 0972745 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113216 A

Priority

DE 19831186 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a tubular shell handle (12) which can turn on a pin part (8''), also of circular cross section, of a turning lever (8). Via a ring joint formed in the region of the free end of the grip and directed inwards of the lever, the lever is held by a safety element (16). The pin is led out of the pin part of the turning lever and through the ring joint. The fork-side end of the handle is angled to a wedge shape, narrowing on two diametrically opposite sides.

Abstract (de)

Solche Betätigungsvorrichtungen sollen einfach und sicher handhabbar sein, jedoch hinreichend Schutz gegen unbeabsichtugtes Auslösen bieten. Um die Entnahme von Flüssigkeiten unter Druck aus einem Behälter sicher und störungslos zu bewerkstelligen, ist vorgesehen, einen in eine Rastnut eingreifenden Arretierstift gegen den Druck einer Feder durch Verdrehen eines Griffs zu entriegeln und durch bloßes Niederdrücken des Griffs wieder zu verriegeln. Die Betätigungsvorrichtung eignet sich für die Entnahme von Flüssigkeiten aus Behältern, in denen sie unter Druck stehen, insbesondere für die Entnahme von Bier aus Fässern oder Kegs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/0829 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29820465 U1 19990225; DE 19831186 A1 20000120; DE 19831186 C2 20011129; EP 0972745 A1 20000119

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031015

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI