Global Patent Index - EP 0972768 A1

EP 0972768 A1 2000-01-19 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE IMIDAZOLE COMPOUNDS, INTERMEDIATES FOR SYNTHESIZING THE SAME, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE IMIDAZOLE COMPOUNDS, INTERMEDIATES FOR SYNTHESIZING THE SAME, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG OPTISCH AKTIVER IMIDAZOLVERBINDUNGEN, ZWISCHENPRODUKTE ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSES D'IMIDAZOL OPTO-ACTIFS, INTERMEDIAIRES AUX FINS DE LA SYNTHESE DE CES COMPOSES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 0972768 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98900397 A

Priority

  • JP 9800150 W
  • JP 1011497 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a method for producing an optically active 4-Ä alpha -hydroxy-5-(1-imidazolyl)-2-methylbenzylÜ-3,5-dimethylbenzoic acid or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, which includes subjecting a compound of the formula (I) <CHEM> wherein each symbol in the formula is as defined in the specification, to optical resolution by fractional crystallization to give an optically active compound thereof and subjecting the compound to hydrolysis reaction. According to this method, a resolution method useful for industrial large-scale production of the optically active compound of 4-Ä alpha -hydroxy-5-(1-imidazolyl)-2-methylbenzylÜ-3,5-dimethylbenzoic acid, which is useful as a thromboxane synthetase inhibitor and an agent for the prophylaxis and treatment of diabetic complications, can be obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 233/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 233/58 (2006.01); C07D 233/60 (2006.01); C07D 521/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 231/12 (2013.01); C07D 233/56 (2013.01); C07D 249/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972768 A1 20000119; EP 0972768 A4 20010627; EP 0972768 B1 20031015; AT 252085 T 20031115; AT 337306 T 20060915; AU 5496698 A 19980818; CA 2278509 A1 19980730; CA 2278509 C 20070320; CN 1133623 C 20040107; CN 1251093 A 20000419; DE 69818983 D1 20031120; DE 69818983 T2 20040909; DE 69835705 D1 20061005; EP 1378507 A2 20040107; EP 1378507 A3 20040204; EP 1378507 B1 20060823; ES 2209104 T3 20040616; JP 2000290259 A 20001017; US 6066739 A 20000523; US 6166221 A 20001226; WO 9832740 A1 19980730

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080114

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080115

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070109

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209104 T3

2004-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031015

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-01-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-01-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-01-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69818983 P 20031120

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAWASAKI, KAZUYUKI;,YOSHITOMI PHARM. INDUS. LTD.

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOBAYASHI, HARUHITO;,YOSHITOMI PHARM. INDUS. LTD

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EHARA, SYUJI;,YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL IND. LTD

2003-10-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SATO, HIDEAKI;,YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL IND. LTD.

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI PHARMA CORPORATION

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-06-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WELFIDE CORPORATION

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990722

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990722;LT PAYMENT 19990722;LV PAYMENT 19990722;MK PAYMENT 19990722;RO PAYMENT 19990722;SI PAYMENT 19990722