Global Patent Index - EP 0972810 A1

EP 0972810 A1 2000-01-19 - Mixtures of reactive dyes and their use for dyeing material containing hydroxy and/or carbonamide groups

Title (en)

Mixtures of reactive dyes and their use for dyeing material containing hydroxy and/or carbonamide groups

Title (de)

Mischungen von faserreaktiven Farbstoffen und deren Verwendung zum Färben von hydroxy- und/oder carbonamidhaltigem Material

Title (fr)

Mélanges de colorants réactifs et leur utilisation pour la teinture de materiaux contenant des groupes hydroxy et/ou carbonamide

Publication

EP 0972810 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113487 A

Priority

DE 19832220 A

Abstract (en)

Reactive dye mixture contains dye(s) (IA) with a 2,4-difluoro-pyrimidin-6-yl group and dye(s) (IB) with a 4,6-difluoro-pyrimidin-2-yl group, with a chromophore group corresponding to a mono- or disazo dye or metal complex or a 1-amino-4-sulfophenyl-2-sulfo-anthraquinone dye. Reactive dye mixture contains dye(s) of formula (IA) with a 2,4-difluoro-pyrimidin-6-yl group and dye(s) (IB) of formula with a 4,6-difluoro-pyrimidin-2-yl group, with a chromophore group corresponding to a mono- or disazo dye or metal complex or a 1-amino-4-sulfophenyl-2-sulfo-anthraquinone dye: A-XA (IA) A-XB (IB) XA = 2,4-difluoro-pyrimidin-6-yl; XB = 4,6-difluoro-pyrimidin-2-yl; A = a chromophore group. The full definitions are given in the DEFINITIONS (Full Definitions) Field. An Independent claim is also included for a method of dyeing material, especially fibrous material, containing hydroxyl and/or carbonamido groups by applying a mixture of dyes (IA) and (IB) and fixing using heat and/or alkali.

Abstract (de)

Es werden Farbstoffmischungen beschrieben, die einen oder mehrere organische Farbstoffe der unterschiedlichsten Farbstoffklassen mit dem faserreaktiven 2,4-Difluor-pyrimidin-6-yl-Rest und einen oder mehrere organische Farbstoffe der unterschiedlichsten Farbstoffklassen mit dem faserreaktiven 4,6-Difluorpyrimidin-4-yl-Rest enthalten. Die Farbstoffmischungen eignen sich sehr gut zum Färben von hydroxy- und/oder carbonamidgruppenhaltigen Materialien, insbesondere Fasermaterialien, in farbkräftigen Tönen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09B 67/22; C09B 62/20; D06P 1/382

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09B 62/20 (2006.01); C09B 62/22 (2006.01); C09B 62/24 (2006.01); C09B 67/22 (2006.01); D06P 1/38 (2006.01); D06P 1/382 (2006.01); D06P 3/10 (2006.01); D06P 3/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/382 (2013.01); C09B 62/20 (2013.01); C09B 67/0038 (2013.01); C09B 67/004 (2013.01); C09B 67/0053 (2013.01); C09B 67/0058 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972810 A1 20000119; DE 19832220 A1 20000120; JP 2000072978 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI