Global patent index - EP 0972826 A1

EP 0972826 A1 2000-01-19 - Process for producing a powder from a packaged tablet

Title (en)

Process for producing a powder from a packaged tablet

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Pulvers aus einer verpackten Tablette

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'une poudre à partir d'une tablette emballée

Publication

EP 0972826 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98202400 A

Priority

EP 98202400 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a process for producing a powder from a packaged tablet, the package comprising plastic materials, whereby the process is characterised in that it comprises a first step of submitting the packaged tablet to mechanical degradation with first mechanical degradation means, a second step of sifting with first sifting means to obtain an intermediate material, a third step of submitting the intermediate material to mechanical degradation with second mechanical degradation means, and a fourth step of sifting with second sifting means to obtain the powder, whereby the powder obtained comprises less than 0.05% per weight of plastic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06; B02C 19/12; B65B 69/00; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 69/00 (2006.01); B02C 19/00 (2006.01); B02C 23/08 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/00 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972826 A1 20000119; AR 021182 A1 20020703; AU 4999799 A 20000207; BR 9912083 A 20010925; CA 2336953 A1 20000127; CN 1309696 A 20010822; JP 2002520238 A 20020709; WO 0004127 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030210

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI