Global Patent Index - EP 0972850 A1

EP 0972850 A1 2000-01-19 - Process for refining aluminium

Title (en)

Process for refining aluminium

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Feinen von Aluminium

Title (fr)

Procédé de raffinage de l'aluminium

Publication

EP 0972850 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99113443 A

Priority

US 9253998 P

Abstract (en)

A process for melting an aluminum charge into molten aluminum and simultaneously refining the molten aluminum to produce a refined molten aluminum having a low hydrogen content in a direct fired furnace is provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 21/00; F27B 14/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 21/00 (2006.01); C22B 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 21/0084 (2013.01); C22B 21/064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972850 A1 20000119; AU 5458499 A 20000201; CA 2337793 A1 20000120; WO 0003046 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040406

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI