Global Patent Index - EP 0972855 A1

EP 0972855 A1 2000-01-19 - Method and apparatus for ammonia synthesis at atmospheric pressure

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for ammonia synthesis at atmospheric pressure

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ammoniaksynthese bei Atmosphärendruck

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de synthèse d'ammoniac à pression atmosphérique

Publication

EP 0972855 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99600008 A

Priority

GR 98100255 A

Abstract (en)

Prototype reactor and method for the ammonia synthesis at atmospheric pressure. This invention relates to the ammonia production from its elements (N2 and H2) at atmospheric pressure. This was achieved in a solid state proton (H<+>) conducting cell - reactor. Hydrogen was flowing over the anode (6) and was converted into protons that were transported through the solid electrolyte (4) and reached the cathode (5)(Pd) over which nitrogen was passing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25B 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0480116 A1 19920415 - VAYENAS CONSTANTIN G [GR], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 097, no. 001 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 124, no. 26, 24 June 1996, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 347240, PANAGOS, E. ET AL: "Modeling of equilibrium limited hydrogenation reactions carried out in H+ conducting solid oxide membrane reactors" XP002091039 & CHEM. ENG. SCI. (1996), 51(11), 3175-3180 CODEN: CESCAC;ISSN: 0009-2509, 1996CHEM. ENG. SCI. (1996), 51(11), 3175-3180 CODEN: CESCAC;ISSN: 0009-25091996
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8803, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E36, AN 88-017141, XP002091040

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972855 A1 20000119; EP 0972855 B1 20030122; DE 69904990 D1 20030227; GR 1003196 B 19990901

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-12-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-23 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904990 P 20030227

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOUKIDES, MICHAEL, CTR FOR RESEARCH&TECHN.HELLAS

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARNELLOS, GEORGOS, CTR FOR RES.&TECHN.-HELLAS

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENTRE FOR RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY HELLAS

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STOUKIDES, MICHAEL, CENTRE FOR RESEARCH AND TECHN

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARNELLOS, GEORGOS, CENTRE FOR RESEARCH AND TECHN

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOUKIDIS, MICHALIS, CTR FOR RESEARCH&TECHN.HELLAS

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARNELLOS, GEORGOS, CTR FOR RES.&TECHN.-HELLAS

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI