Global Patent Index - EP 0972877 A2

EP 0972877 A2 2000-01-19 - Calender for paper webs or similar material

Title (en)

Calender for paper webs or similar material

Title (de)

Kalander für Bahnen aus Papier oder ähnlichem Material

Title (fr)

Calandre pour bandes de papier ou analogue

Publication

EP 0972877 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111771 A

Priority

DE 19832066 A

Abstract (en)

The calender assembly, to process webs of paper and similar materials, has a roller (8) with an adjustable bending action in one roller stack (2) and a similar roller (9) in the other roller stack (3). They are of a lifting roller mantle type, and are next to each other to give an additional roller nip (34). The roller bend adjustment mechanism acts selectively at the associated roller stack (2,3) or to the other adjustable bend roller (8,9). The roller bend adjustment system has a support which is moved by an angle through a setting unit (22). The bearing mounting for the carrier of at least one adjustable bending roller (9) has an eccentric, which can reduce the gap between it and the neighboring adjustable bend roller (8). The eccentric is rotated together with the carrier by the setting unit (22). The two stacks of rollers (2,3) have a common center plane, at an angle to the horizontal. The roller stacks (2,3) have an uneven number of rollers and preferably five rollers in each, where each nip (25-33) is formed by a hard and a soft roller. The adjustable bend rollers (8,9) forming an additional nip (34) both have elastic mantle claddings.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kalander (1) für Bahnen aus Papier oder ähnlichem Material weist zwei Walzenstapel (2, 3) auf, die je an mindestens einem Ende eine Durchbiegungseinstellwalze (4, 8, 9, 13) aufweisen. Eine Durchbiegungseinstellwalze (8) des einen Walzenstapels (2) und eine Durchbiegungseinstellwalze (9) des anderen Walzenstapels (3) sind vom Mantelhub-Typ und einander benachbart und können einen unter Ausnutzung des Mantelhubs schließbaren Zusatznip (34) bilden. Die Wirkrichtung der Durchbiegungseinstelleinrichtung weist wahlweise zum zugehörigen Walzenstapel oder zur anderen Durchbiegungseinstellwalze. Auf diese Weise kann ohne großen Aufwand eine weitere Art der Satinage, insbesondere Mattsatinage, zusätzlich erzielt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0226 (2013.01); D21G 1/00 (2013.01); D21G 1/022 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972877 A2 20000119; EP 0972877 A3 20000517; EP 0972877 B1 20030827; AT 248250 T 20030915; CA 2277428 A1 20000116; DE 19832066 A1 20000217; DE 19832066 C2 20000608; US 6336398 B1 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090618

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-24 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20080708

2007-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-06-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060619

2005-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050614

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-07-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EDUARD KUESTERSMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-06-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-10-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906745

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI