Global patent index - EP 0972878 A2

EP 0972878 A2 2000-01-19 - Calender for paper webs or similar material

Title (en)

Calender for paper webs or similar material

Title (de)

Kalander für Bahnen aus Papier oder ähnlichem Material

Title (fr)

Calandre pour bandes de papier ou analogue

Publication

EP 0972878 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111772 A

Priority

DE 19832067 A

Abstract (en)

In the calender assembly, for processing a paper web, the intermediate roller (5,10) next to the upper adjustable bend roller (4,9) in each roller stack is in a fixed position at the frame. The upper adjustable bend rollers (4,9) give a variable pressure in the top nips (25,26), independently of the pressures applied on the web in the following nips (28-33). Both end rollers (4,8,9,13) are lifting mantle types, on fixed carriers. The intermediate rollers (6,7,11,12) below the upper intermediate rollers (5,10) are mounted on levers (27), which pivot on axes mounted to the frame. Two identical stacks of rollers (2,3) are in succession in the direction of web (24) travel. The top intermediate roller (5) of the first roller stack (2) acts on one side of the web (24), and the top intermediate roller (10) of the second roller stack (3) acts on the other side of the web (24).

Abstract (de)

Ein Kalander (1) für Bahnen (24) aus Papier oder ähnlichem Material besitzt einen Ständer (16) und mindestens einen Walzenstapel (2, 3), der wenigstens vier Walzen (4 bis 13) aufweist. Die beiden Endwalzen (4, 8, 9, 13) sind als Durchbiegungseinstellwalzen ausgebildet. Die der oberen Durchbiegungseinstellwalze (4, 9) benachbarte Zwischenwalze (5, 10) ist ständerfest gelagert. Mit Hilfe der oberen Durchbiegungseinstellwalze (4, 9) ist die Druckspannung im obersten Nip (25, 26) unabhängig von der Druckspannung in den folgenden Nips (28 bis 33) einstellbar. Auf diese Weise ergeben sich verbesserte Möglichkeiten zur Behandlung der Papierbahn. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972878 A2 20000119; EP 0972878 A3 20000517; EP 0972878 B1 20030827; AT 248251 T 20030915; CA 2277426 A1 20000116; CA 2277426 C 20040203; DE 19832067 A1 20000120; DE 19832067 B4 20050421; US 6305280 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-05-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59906746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-06-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060619

2005-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050614

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-10-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020415

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000429

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI